EP4159511 - COOLING MODULE SUPPORT BRACKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | 21.08.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO CAR CORPORATION 405 31 Göteborg / SE | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Halsius, Thomas 461 32 Trollhättan / SE | 02 /
Viberg, Ella 415 73 Göteborg / SE | 03 /
Behbahani, Kaveh 437 33 Lindome / SE | 04 /
Bechara, José 417 20 Göteborg / SE | 05 /
Hansson, Bo 417 13 Göteborg / SE | 06 /
Sauvage, Sylvain 423 63 Torslanda / SE | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21199852.1 | 29.09.2021 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4159511 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60K11/04 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
B60K11/04 (EP,US);
B62D21/152 (US);
B60R19/34 (US);
B60R19/48 (US);
B62D25/084 (US);
B60Y2306/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] |
Former [2023/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLMODUL-HALTERUNGSKLAMMER | [2023/14] | English: | COOLING MODULE SUPPORT BRACKET | [2023/14] | French: | PATTE DE SUPPORT DE MODULE DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2023/14] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | 25.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1323566 (HELLA BEHR FAHRZEUGSYSTEME [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0018] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]JP2005335668 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP2263902 (TOYOTA TEKKO KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0037] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP3225512 (TOYOTA TEKKO KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0036] * * figures 1-9 * |