EP3978193 - ATTACHMENT FOR IMPACT ROTARY TOOLS AND TOOL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Holdings Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2022/23] |
Former [2022/14] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHINO, Seiji Osaka-shi, Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
SEKO, Shinji Osaka-shi, Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
SHIMIZU, Hidenori Osaka-shi, Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
YAMANAKA, Yasuhiro Osaka-shi, Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 21199882.8 | 29.09.2021 | [2022/14] | Priority number, date | JP20200165740 | 30.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020165740 | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3978193 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B25B21/02, B23B45/00, B25B23/00, B25D17/00 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
B25B21/02 (EP);
B25B23/0007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFSATZ FÜR ROTIERENDE SCHLAGWERKZEUGE UND WERKZEUGSYSTEM | [2022/14] | English: | ATTACHMENT FOR IMPACT ROTARY TOOLS AND TOOL SYSTEM | [2022/14] | French: | ACCESSOIRE POUR OUTILS ROTATIFS À IMPACT ET SYSTÈME D'OUTILS | [2022/14] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 03.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0143086 (FERIOLI FILIPPO SRL [IT]) [X] 1-4,7,8,11 * abstract *; | [XI]US5170545 (HUBSCHER DARIN W [CA]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 25 - line 57; figure 1 * [I] 5,6; | [XI]GB2260936 (LALLIER GUY) [X] 1-3,8,11 * page 3, line 29 - page 8, line 21; figures 1-8 * [I] 5,6; | [X]EP1094571 (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INT [FR]) [X] 1,2,7,10* paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-4b *; | [XI]US2005048884 (BAKER TIMOTHY [US]) [X] 1-4,9,11 * abstract * [I] 5,6; | [X]WO2010020097 (YAO GENG [CN]) [X] 1,7 * abstract *; | [X]US2012024096 (ADKINS EDWARD D [US]) [X] 1,9,11 * abstract *; | [X]EP2933061 (INGERSOLL RAND CO [US]) [X] 1-4,7 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2015020243 |