EP3961262 - POINT CLOUD RAIL ASSETS DATA EXTRACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ground Transportation Systems Canada Inc. 105 Moatfield Drive Toronto ON M3B 0A4 / CA | [2024/13] |
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states Thales Canada Inc. 105 Moatfield Drive Toronto, Ontario M3B 0A4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Jaewook Toronto, Ontario M3B 0A4 / CA | 02 /
SOHN, Gunho Toronto, Ontario M3B 0A4 / CA | 03 /
RICKARD, Michael Toronto, Ontario M3B 0A4 / CA | 04 /
GREEN, Alon Toronto, Ontario M3B 0A4 / CA | 05 /
KINIO, Walter Toronto, Ontario M3B 0A4 / CA | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Hautier IP - MC/EP 17, avenue Albert II C/º The Office & Co - L'ALBU 98000 Monaco / MC | [N/P] |
Former [2022/09] | Hautier IP 1, Rue du Gabian Le Thalès - 12 Etg - Bloc A 98000 Monaco / MC | Application number, filing date | 21199927.1 | 16.11.2018 | [2022/09] | Priority number, date | US201762587760P | 17.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762587760 P | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3961262 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/89, G06K9/00 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
G06T19/00 (EP,US);
G06T7/12 (EP,US);
G06T7/143 (EP,US);
G06T7/277 (EP,US);
G06V20/182 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10028 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30184 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30241 (EP,US);
G06T2210/56 (EP,US);
G06T2219/004 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] |
Former [2022/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DATENEXTRAKTION VON SCHIENENANLAGEN AUS PUNKTWOLKENDATEN | [2022/09] | English: | POINT CLOUD RAIL ASSETS DATA EXTRACTION | [2022/09] | French: | EXTRACTION DE DONNÉES D'ACTIF DE RAIL CLOUD EN POINTS | [2022/09] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 01.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 21.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18878777.4 / EP3710863 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 21.11.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 21.11.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.11.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016221592 (PUTTAGUNTA SHANMUKHA SRAVAN [US], et al); |