EP3978832 - MULTI-AIR CONDITIONER FOR HEATING AND COOLING OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL 07336 / KR | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Hyungjoon Seoul / KR | 02 /
Park, Junseong Seoul / KR | 03 /
Sa, Yongcheol Seoul / KR | 04 /
Kim, Daehyoung Seoul / KR | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 21200396.6 | 01.10.2021 | [2022/14] | Priority number, date | KR20200127983 | 05.10.2020 Original published format: KR 20200127983 | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3978832 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3978832 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F25B13/00, F25B31/00, F25B41/20, F25B45/00, F25B49/02 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
F25B13/00 (EP,CN,US);
F25B31/004 (EP,KR,US);
F24F5/001 (CN);
F25B49/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F25B41/20 (EP,KR);
F25B41/34 (CN);
F25B41/40 (KR);
F25B43/006 (CN,KR);
F25B43/02 (CN,KR,US);
F25B45/00 (EP);
F25B2313/023 (KR);
F25B2313/0231 (US);
F25B2313/0233 (US);
F25B2313/0253 (EP);
F25B2313/02741 (US);
F25B2400/13 (EP);
F25B2500/16 (EP,KR);
F25B2500/31 (EP);
F25B2600/2519 (EP);
F25B2600/2523 (EP,KR);
F25B2700/03 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] |
Former [2022/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEHRFACHKLIMAANLAGE FÜR HEIZ- UND KÜHLBETRIEB | [2022/14] | English: | MULTI-AIR CONDITIONER FOR HEATING AND COOLING OPERATIONS | [2022/14] | French: | MULTICLIMATISEUR POUR OPÉRATIONS DE CHAUFFAGE ET DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2022/14] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 27.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2019143195 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [IA]EP3534086 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [XPA]EP3742075 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) | by applicant | KR20010059700 | KR20140018536 |