EP3979451 - AI-BASED SOFTWARE SERVICE TO SHAVE ELECTRICITY CONSUMPTION PEAK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Space Pte. Ltd. 2 Kallang Sector Singapore 349277 / SG | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yi Singapore 349277 / SG | 02 /
LIM, Elissa Yanting Singapore 349277 / SG | 03 /
SANTOSA, Rully Adrian Singapore 349277 / SG | 04 /
TAN, Soon Siang Singapore 349277 / SG | 05 /
HU, Yiqun Singapore 349277 / SG | 06 /
CHEN, Yanhui Singapore 349277 / SG | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 21200412.1 | 01.10.2021 | [2022/14] | Priority number, date | SG20201009796Y | 01.10.2020 Original published format: SG10202009796Y | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3979451 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3979451 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/00, H02J3/32, H02J7/00 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
H02J3/003 (EP,US);
H02J3/004 (US);
H02J3/24 (US);
H02J3/28 (US);
H02J3/32 (EP);
H02J7/00712 (EP);
Y04S10/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KI-BASIERTER SOFTWAREDIENST ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON STROMVERBRAUCHSSPITZEN | [2022/14] | English: | AI-BASED SOFTWARE SERVICE TO SHAVE ELECTRICITY CONSUMPTION PEAK | [2022/14] | French: | SERVICE LOGICIEL BASÉ SUR L'IA POUR RÉDUIRE LES PICS DE CONSOMMATION D'ÉLECTRICITÉ | [2022/14] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 17.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2019042992 (FIFE JOHN MICHAEL [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0034] - [0035] - [0075] - [0085] - [0091] , [0120] , [0163] - [0165] - [0229] - [0234] - [0276] *; | [A]KR102014201B (KIM YOUNG IL [KR]) [A] 1,9* paragraphs [0031] - [0032] * |