EP3985472 - REGULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES, GR, HR, RS | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikki Co., Ltd. 3029 Kamiechi Atsugi, Kanagawa 243-0801 / JP | [2024/11] |
Former [2022/16] | For all designated states Nikki Co., Ltd. 3029 Kamiechi Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0801 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUENAGA, Naoya Atsugi, 243-0801 / JP | 02 /
AIZAWA, Shutaro Atsugi, 243-0801 / JP | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 21200660.5 | 04.10.2021 | [2022/16] | Priority number, date | JP20200175662 | 19.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020175662 | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3985472 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3985472 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05D16/10 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
G05D16/103 (EP);
F16K17/30 (CN);
F02M21/0239 (US);
F16K1/42 (US);
F16K17/04 (US);
F16K27/0209 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] |
Former [2022/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | REGLER | [2022/16] | English: | REGULATOR | [2022/16] | French: | RÉGULATEUR | [2022/16] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 04.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 13.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2015008200 (METATRON S R L [IT]) [Y] 1,2 * page 5, line 25 - page 12, line 15 *; | [Y]EP3462272 (NIKKI CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0035] *; | [A]EP3623671 (NIKKI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2* column 6, line 20 - column 7, line 31 * | by applicant | JPS5292436U | JP2017193078 | JP2019067216 |