EP3981678 - SUPPORT STRUCTURE FOR IN-VEHICLE COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suzuki Motor Corporation 300, Takatsuka-cho Minami-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 432-8611 / JP | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHII, Tatsuki Hamamatsu-shi, 432-8611 / JP | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 21201254.6 | 06.10.2021 | [2022/15] | Priority number, date | JP20200171156 | 09.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020171156 | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3981678 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3981678 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B62J17/10, B62J6/027, // B62J17/02 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
B62J6/027 (EP);
B62J11/00 (US);
B62J17/10 (EP);
B62J17/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/15] | B62J17/10, B62J6/027 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRÄGERSTRUKTUR FÜR EIN FAHRZEUGBAUTEIL | [2022/15] | English: | SUPPORT STRUCTURE FOR IN-VEHICLE COMPONENT | [2022/15] | French: | STRUCTURE DE SUPPORT POUR COMPOSANT DE VÉHICULE EMBARQUÉ | [2022/15] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 02.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2010125898 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]EP2332812 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [I]JP2014065464 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]US2015266410 (TAKAYA SATOSHI [JP]) | by applicant | JP2013193594 |