EP4163491 - METHOD OF PERFORMING SERVICE WORK ON A HORIZONTAL AXIS WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liftra IP ApS Stationsmestervej 81 9200 Aalborg SV / DK | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENGER, Per Eske 9575 Terndrup / DK | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 21201395.7 | 07.10.2021 | [2023/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4163491 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/02, F03D80/50 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
F03D80/50 (EP);
F03D7/0224 (EP);
F03D7/024 (EP);
F03D7/0296 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON WARTUNGSARBEITEN AN EINER WINDTURBINE MIT HORIZONTALER ACHSE | [2023/15] | English: | METHOD OF PERFORMING SERVICE WORK ON A HORIZONTAL AXIS WIND TURBINE | [2023/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'EXÉCUTION D'UNE OPÉRATION DE MAINTENANCE SUR UNE ÉOLIENNE À AXE HORIZONTAL | [2023/15] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/11] | 07.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP2306005 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [Y]US2017306930 (FENGER PER E [DK]); | [A]US9803621 (SIMONSEN KENNETH TOUGAARD [DK], et al); | [Y]WO2020221716 (LIFTRA IP APS [DK]) | by applicant | WO2016055065 |