EP4019297 - BUILT-IN UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.07.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.07.2024 | Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACPS Automotive GmbH Bertha-Benz-Strasse 2 74379 Ingersheim / DE | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kadnikov, Aleksej 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 21201448.4 | 07.10.2021 | [2022/26] | Priority number, date | DE202010128532 | 29.10.2020 Original published format: DE102020128532 | [2022/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4019297 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60D1/06, B60D1/64, H01R13/73 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
B60D1/06 (EP);
B60D1/64 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] |
Former [2022/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINBAUEINHEIT | [2022/26] | English: | BUILT-IN UNIT | [2022/26] | French: | UNITÉ D'INSTALLATION | [2022/26] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 16.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.01.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0119937 (TUBUS COMPOSITE PANELS AG [CH], et al); | [XYI]DE29825216U (ORIS FAHRZEUGTEILE RIEHLE H [DE]); | [Y]DE202010003623U (WESTFALIA AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]); | [XYI]EP2952367 (SCAMBIA HOLDINGS CYPRUS LTD [CY]) |