EP4102567 - IMAGE SENSOR STRUCTURE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VisEra Technologies Company Limited No. 12, Dusing Rd. 1 Hsinchu Science Park Hsinchu 300-78 / TW | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAI, Lai-Hung Hsinchu City / TW | 02 /
HSIEH, Chin-Chuan Hsinchu City / TW | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21201602.6 | 08.10.2021 | [2022/50] | Priority number, date | US202117345592 | 11.06.2021 Original published format: US202117345592 | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4102567 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4102567 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
H01L27/14669 (EP);
H01L27/1462 (EP,KR);
H01L27/14621 (CN);
H01L27/14685 (CN,KR,US);
H01L27/14625 (EP);
H01L27/14627 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | BILDSENSORSTRUKTUR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/50] | English: | IMAGE SENSOR STRUCTURE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | [2022/50] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CAPTEUR D'IMAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/50] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 28.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2010060756 (INUIYA MASAFUMI [JP]); | [Y]US2011272772 (KOKUBUN KOICHI [JP]); | [Y]WO2019081416 (SONY CORP [JP], et al); | [XYI]WO2020105360 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]); | [XAYI]EP3709361 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |