EP3934403 - A BLIND MATING ADAPTING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baidu USA LLC 1195 Bordeaux Drive Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Tianyi Sunnyvale, 94089 / US | [2022/01] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21201816.2 | 11.10.2021 | [2022/01] | Priority number, date | US202117191243 | 03.03.2021 Original published format: US202117191243 | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3934403 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3934403 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
H05K7/20781 (EP,CN);
H05K7/20272 (EP,CN,US);
H05K7/1417 (US);
G06F1/20 (CN);
H05K5/0217 (CN);
H05K7/1487 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANPASSUNGSEINHEIT FÜR BLINDPAARUNG | [2022/01] | English: | A BLIND MATING ADAPTING UNIT | [2022/01] | French: | UNITÉ D'ADAPTATION D'ASSEMBLAGE EN AVEUGLE | [2022/01] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/14] | 18.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017257980 (FUKUNAGA NAOMI [JP]) [X] 1,10 * paragraphs [0025] - [0099]; figures 1-9 * [I] 7-9,11; | [A]US10164373 (CHEON KIOAN [US], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [XI]CN112020264 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,10,11 * figures 2-17 * * the whole document * [I] 7-9 |