EP3971168 - HETEROARYL SUBSTITUTED BETA-HYDROXYETHYLAMINES FOR USE IN TREATING HYPERGLYCAEMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atrogi AB Tomtebodavägen 6 171 65 Solna / SE | [2023/37] |
Former [2022/12] | For all designated states Atrogi AB Cardellgatan 1 114 36 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pelcman, Benjamin 113 52 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
Bengtsson, Tore 185 94 Vaxholm / SE | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/12] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 21201891.5 | 13.09.2018 | [2022/12] | Priority number, date | GB20170014745 | 13.09.2017 Original published format: GB 201714745 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3971168 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/42, C07D277/28, C07D277/40, C07D213/38, C07D213/64, C07D213/65, A61K31/426, A61K31/4412, A61K31/435, A61K31/505, A61P3/10 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
C07D277/40 (EP,KR);
A61K31/4412 (US);
A61K31/426 (KR,US);
A61K31/44 (US);
A61K31/505 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P3/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07D213/38 (EP,KR,US);
C07D213/64 (EP,US);
C07D213/643 (KR);
C07D213/65 (EP);
C07D239/36 (US);
C07D239/42 (EP,KR);
C07D277/24 (US);
C07D277/28 (EP);
C07D277/56 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | HETEROARYLSUBSTITUIERTE BETA-HYDROXYETHYLAMINE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON HYPERGLYKÄMIE | [2022/12] | English: | HETEROARYL SUBSTITUTED BETA-HYDROXYETHYLAMINES FOR USE IN TREATING HYPERGLYCAEMIA | [2022/12] | French: | BÊTA-HYDROXYÉTHYLAMINO SUBSTITUÉES PAR HÉTÉROARYLE DESTINÉES À ÊTRE UTILISÉES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE L'HYPERGLYCÉMIE | [2022/12] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 09.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18773826.5 / EP3681872 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3952101 (JEN TIMOTHY YU-WEN, et al); | [XY]US4024156 (BAGLI JEHAN F, et al); | [XY]US5019578 (FISHER MICHAEL H [US], et al); | [Y]US2005250944 (CHEN JIAN [US]); | [AP]WO2017153737 (ATROGI AB [SE]); | by applicant | WO2008054155 |