EP4163875 - ASSET AND COLLISION VISUALISATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Schweiz AG Freilagerstrasse 40 8047 Zürich / CH | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blatter, Sandro 9015 St. Gallen / CH | 02 /
Zechlin, Oliver 6300 Zug / CH | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 21201910.3 | 11.10.2021 | [2023/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4163875 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06T19/00 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
G06T19/006 (EP);
G06T2210/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] |
Former [2023/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGEN- UND KOLLISIONSVISUALISIERUNG | [2023/15] | English: | ASSET AND COLLISION VISUALISATION | [2023/15] | French: | VISUALISATION DE COLLISION ET D'ACTIFS | [2023/15] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 18.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016210790 (RASANE SHAILESH [AU], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [XI]US2019385373 (MITTLEMAN ADAM [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11-13 * abstract * * fig. 14, fig. 22B; fig. 12; paragraphs [0108] , [0153] , [0130] , [0128] * [I] 3-10,14,15; | [X] - Junghanns Sebastian ET AL, "Employing location-aware handheld augmented reality to assist utilities field personnel", (20090101), URL: https://arbook.icg.tugraz.at/schmalstieg/Schmalstieg_140.pdf, (20220228), XP055896011 [X] 1,11-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0059] , [0060]; figures 1-3 * |