EP4002835 - INDIRECT VIEWING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING A FRAME RATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEKRA Lang GmbH & Co. KG Buchheimer Straße 4 91465 Ergersheim / DE | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lang, Dr., Werner 91465 Ergersheim / DE | 02 /
Geißendörfer, Peter 91722 Arberg / DE | 03 /
Redlingshöfer, Andreas 90619 Trautskirchen / DE | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Alpspitz IP Longinusstraße 1 81247 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/21] | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21201991.3 | 11.10.2021 | [2022/21] | Priority number, date | DE202010129908 | 12.11.2020 Original published format: DE102020129908 | [2022/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4002835 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/01, B60R1/00 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
H04N7/0127 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B60R1/00 (US);
B60R1/22 (KR);
H04N23/54 (KR);
H04N23/76 (US);
H04N23/80 (CN,KR);
H04N23/951 (KR);
H04N5/77 (KR);
H04N7/181 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INDIREKTES SICHTSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ANPASSEN EINER BILDWIEDERHOLUNGSRATE | [2022/21] | English: | INDIRECT VIEWING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING A FRAME RATE | [2022/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE VISUALISATION INDIRECTE ET PROCÉDÉ D'AJUSTEMENT D'UNE FRÉQUENCE DE TRAMES | [2022/21] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 22.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005184395 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]US2011109796 (SUBEDAR MAHESH [US], et al); | [Y]US2017291550 (SASAGUCHI ATSUMI [JP], et al); |