EP4029757 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A TRAFFIC SITUATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Mobility GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALMER, Andrew Spring Hill, 4004 / AU | 02 /
BRÄMER, Emanuel 12355 Berlin / DE | 03 /
WILHELM, Markus 41239 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 21202312.1 | 13.10.2021 | [2022/29] | Priority number, date | DE202110200252 | 13.01.2021 Original published format: DE102021200252 | [2022/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4029757 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B61L15/00, B61L27/57 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
B61L15/0081 (EP);
B61L27/57 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINER VERKEHRSSITUATION | [2022/29] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A TRAFFIC SITUATION | [2022/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNE SITUATION DE CIRCULATION | [2022/29] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/26] | 10.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE102006029844 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,10,12-14 * Figuren 1, 2 und 5; Absätze [0001], [0012], [0022],[0031] und [0032] * [A] 3 [I] 5,7-9,11; | [A]WO2019092248 (DB FERNVERKEHR AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-14* Abschnitt 3. *; | [XI]EP3647153 (HITACHI RAIL LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,6,10,12-14 * Figuren 1 - 4; Absätze [0001], [0027], [0029] und [0030] * [I] 5,7-9,11 |