EP3986104 - CASE BODY AND CHARGING PILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sungrow Power Supply Co., Ltd. No.1699 Xiyou Rd. New & High Technology Industrial Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | [2024/18] |
Former [2022/16] | For all designated states Sungrow Power Supply Co., Ltd. No.1699 Xiyou Rd., New & High Technology Industrial Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Yuefeng Hefei, 230088 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Nan Hefei, 230088 / CN | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Rooney, John-Paul Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 21202507.6 | 13.10.2021 | [2022/16] | Priority number, date | CN202022312172U | 16.10.2020 Original published format: CN 202022312172 U | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3986104 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3986104 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, B60L53/302, B60L53/31 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
H05K7/20918 (EP);
H02J7/0042 (US);
B60L53/302 (EP);
B60L53/31 (EP);
H05K5/0217 (US);
H05K7/20909 (US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP);
Y02T90/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | GEHÄUSEKÖRPER UND LADESÄULE | [2022/16] | English: | CASE BODY AND CHARGING PILE | [2022/16] | French: | CORPS DE BOÎTIER ET PILE DE CHARGE | [2022/16] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 14.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0900621 (LORCH SCHWEISSTECH GMBH [DE]); | [X]US2014268563 (SAGNERI ANTHONY [US], et al); | [XA]WO2016156569 (IER [FR]); | [XA]CN206797165U (ZHEJIANG WANMA HAILISI NEW ENERGY CO LTD) |