EP3984344 - IMPROVED AGRICULTURAL MACHINE FOR CUTTING AND CRUSHING RESIDUAL MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Correction of patent specification | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Torrico S.r.l. Via Torri di Confine 6 36053 Gambellara (VI) / IT | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEGORARO, Luciano 36040 SAREGO (VI) / IT | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Burchielli, Riccardo, et al Barzano & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 21202597.7 | 14.10.2021 | [2022/16] | Priority number, date | IT20200024322 | 15.10.2020 Original published format: IT202000024322 | [2022/16] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3984344 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3984344 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP3984344 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/42, A01D34/62 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
A01D34/62 (EP);
A01D34/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] |
Former [2022/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE MASCHINE ZUM SCHNEIDEN UND ZERKLEINERN VON RESTSTOFFEN | [2022/16] | English: | IMPROVED AGRICULTURAL MACHINE FOR CUTTING AND CRUSHING RESIDUAL MATERIALS | [2022/16] | French: | MACHINE AGRICOLE AMÉLIORÉE POUR LA COUPE ET LE BROYAGE DE MATÉRIAUX RÉSIDUELS | [2022/16] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 15.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.04.2024 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3133598 (CLAY CALDWELL FREDERICK); | [A]FR2851123 (GYRAX [FR]); | [A]US7047714 (STEPHENSON ROGER DALE [US], et al); | [Y]ITVI20080298 (TORRICO S R L); | [Y]ITVI20090056 (FISCHER S R L) |