EP4166089 - IMPROVING CARDIAC ULTRASOUND IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Jason Richard Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
GOOßEN, André Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
WEBER, Frank Michael Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
MERAL, Faik Can Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
VIGNON, Francois Guy Gerard Marie Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
NGUYEN, Man M Eindhoven / NL | 07 /
LOSSAU, Tanja Eindhoven / NL | 08 /
GROTH, Alexandra Eindhoven / NL | 09 /
WILD, Sebastian Eindhoven / NL | 10 /
WAECHTER-STEHLE, Irina Eindhoven / NL | [2023/16] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/16] | Application number, filing date | 21202674.4 | 14.10.2021 | [2023/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4166089 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, A61B8/00 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
A61B8/0883 (EP);
A61B8/483 (EP);
A61B8/5269 (EP);
A61B8/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG DER ULTRASCHALLHERZBILDGEBUNG | [2023/16] | English: | IMPROVING CARDIAC ULTRASOUND IMAGING | [2023/16] | French: | AMÉLIORATION D'IMAGERIE ULTRASONORE CARDIAQUE | [2023/16] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/12] | 13.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018160981 (TSYMBALENKO YELENA VIKTOROVNA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] ** paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0060] *; | [XI]US2021128114 (PATIL ABHIJIT [IN], et al) [X] 1-8,11-14 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0035] * [I] 9,10,15 | by applicant | US5997479 | US6013032 | US6283919 | US6443896 | US6458083 | US6530885 | US6623432 |