EP4166489 - CROSS-FOLD MODULE FOR A FOLDING MACHINE AND FOLDING MACHINE EQUIPPED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H+H GmbH & Co. KG Dunlopstr. 47 33689 Bielefeld / DE | [2023/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bahmer, Frank 33689 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
Melcher, Eduard 33689 Bielefeld / DE | [2023/16] | Representative(s) | Wächter, Jochen, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [2023/16] | Application number, filing date | 21202689.2 | 14.10.2021 | [2023/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4166489 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4166489 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/18, B65H45/14 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
B65H45/18 (EP,KR);
B65H45/164 (US);
B65H45/04 (KR);
B65H45/142 (EP);
B65H5/023 (KR);
B65H2301/3421 (EP);
B65H2301/45 (KR);
B65H2404/254 (EP,US);
B65H2404/2613 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] |
Former [2023/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KREUZBRUCHMODUL FÜR EINE FALZMASCHINE UND DAMIT AUSGERÜSTETE FALZMASCHINE | [2023/16] | English: | CROSS-FOLD MODULE FOR A FOLDING MACHINE AND FOLDING MACHINE EQUIPPED THEREWITH | [2023/16] | French: | MODULE DE PLIAGE CROISÉ POUR UNE MACHINE À PLIER ET MACHINE À PLIANTE ÉQUIPÉE D'UN TEL MODULE | [2023/16] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 16.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]NL7200495 ; | [A]US4682767 (LITTLETON FRANCIS J [US]); | [XAI]EP1475337 (OPPENWEILER BINDER GMBH MASCHB [DE]) |