EP3991695 - ANTHROPOMETRIC POSTERIOR CONDYLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Howmedica Osteonics Corp. 325 Corporate Drive Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUCIANO, Camila Chicago, IL 60610 / US | 02 /
PASCALE, Kenneth Hoboken, NJ 07030 / US | 03 /
BONO, James V. Dover, MA 02030 / US | 04 /
BONO, Olivia Dover, MA 02030 / US | [2024/17] |
Former [2022/18] | 01 /
LUCIANO, Camila Chicago, IL 60610 / US | ||
02 /
PASCALE, Kenneth Hoboken, NJ 07030 / US | |||
03 /
BONO, James V. Dover, MA 02030 / US | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 21203219.7 | 18.10.2021 | [2022/18] | Priority number, date | US202063106385P | 28.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063106385 P | [2022/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3991695 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3991695 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/38, // A61F2/30 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
A61F2/3859 (EP,US);
A61F2/3886 (US);
A61F2/30942 (EP);
A61F2002/30878 (EP);
A61F2002/30948 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | ANTHROPOMETRISCHER HINTERER KONDYLUS | [2022/18] | English: | ANTHROPOMETRIC POSTERIOR CONDYLE | [2022/18] | French: | CONDYLE POSTÉRIEUR ANTHROPOMÉTRIQUE | [2022/18] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 25.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2023 | CZ | 20.12.2023 | EE | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | IT | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | NL | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | PT | 22.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 20.12.2023 | |
CZ | 20.12.2023 | ||
EE | 20.12.2023 | ||
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004249468 (SUGURO TORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,7-11 * paragraphs [0022] - [0029] * * figures 3-6 *; | [A]DE102007003478 (ZIMMER GMBH [CH]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0053] - [0058] ** figures 5-7b *; | [A]US2009265013 (MANDELL STEVEN L [US]) [A] 1-3,8-10 * paragraphs [0074] - [0083] * * figures 7,9 *; | [A]US10076420 (SANFORD ADAM H [US]) [A] 1-15 * columns 8-10 * * figures 4B-6B * | by applicant | US7584080 | US2011194739 |