EP4170789 - A BATTERY MODULE, A BATTERY PACK, AN ELECTRIC VEHICLE, A CELL CARRIER, A CELL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 150-20, Gongse-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pucher, Matthias 8403 Lebring / AT | 02 /
Hadler, Bernhard 8073 Feldkirchen/Graz / AT | 03 /
Ridisser, Markus 8141 Premstätten / AT | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21203348.4 | 19.10.2021 | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4170789 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/213, H01M50/249, H01M50/50, H01M50/502 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
H01M50/213 (EP,KR);
H01M50/256 (KR);
H01M50/107 (KR);
H01M50/249 (EP,KR);
H01M50/264 (KR);
H01M50/50 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEMODUL, BATTERIEPACK, ELEKTROFAHRZEUG, ZELLENTRÄGER, ZELLENANORDNUNG | [2023/17] | English: | A BATTERY MODULE, A BATTERY PACK, AN ELECTRIC VEHICLE, A CELL CARRIER, A CELL ASSEMBLY | [2023/17] | French: | MODULE DE BATTERIE, BLOC-BATTERIE, VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE, SUPPORT DE CELLULE, ENSEMBLE CELLULE | [2023/17] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 29.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2016359210 (HASEGAWA TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1,4-6,8,12-15 * paragraphs [0038] , [0 44] , [0 47] , [0 50]; figures 1, 3, 6; claim 1 * [Y] 2,3,7,11 [I] 9,10; | [Y]WO2019164974 (NIO USA INC [US]) [Y] 7,11* paragraphs [0110] - [0112]; figures 9A, 9B *; | [Y]US2021050635 (LEE JUNG-HOON [KR], et al) [Y] 2,3 * figures 6, 7; claim 1 * | by applicant | CN202352739U | DE102011015621 |