EP3988833 - DUCT SECTION AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A DUCT SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lewo B.V. Laagerfseweg 29 3931 PC Woudenberg / NL | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRATERMAN, Marcel 3931 PC Woudenberg / NL | 02 /
MATTI, Yousif 3931 PC Woudenberg / NL | 03 /
VAN MAAREN, Roeland Wouter 3931 PC Woudenberg / NL | 04 /
ROSKAM, Willem 3931 PC Woudenberg / NL | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Peters, Sebastian Martinus Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Koninginnegracht 19 2514 AB Den Haag / NL | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 21203512.5 | 19.10.2021 | [2022/17] | Priority number, date | NL20202026716 | 20.10.2020 Original published format: NL 2026716 | [2022/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3988833 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3988833 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/086, F23J13/02 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
F16L39/005 (EP);
F16L37/086 (EP);
F23J13/04 (EP);
F23J2213/202 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] |
Former [2022/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 27.10.2022 | Title | German: | KANALABSCHNITT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KANALABSCHNITTS | [2022/17] | English: | DUCT SECTION AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A DUCT SECTION | [2022/17] | French: | SECTION DE CONDUIT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE SECTION DE CONDUIT | [2022/17] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 27.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4114927 (BUTCHER NORMAN P); | [XAYI]DE2829938 (MAUZ & PFEIFFER PROGRESS); | [Y]US5667329 (YODER JR JAMES HERBERT [US]); | [Y]US5685044 (LAVIS GERRY [CA], et al); | [A]DE102007004335 (SEM SCHNEIDER ELEMENTEBAU GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE202007013854U |