EP3971501 - VACUUM ADIABATIC BODY AND REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL 07336 / KR | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Wonyeong 08592 Seoul / KR | 02 /
YOUN, Deokhyun 08592 Seoul / KR | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 21203522.4 | 02.08.2016 | [2022/12] | Priority number, date | KR20150110010 | 04.08.2015 Original published format: KR 20150110010 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3971501 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3971501 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/06, F25D23/02, F25D19/00, F16L59/065 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
F25D23/062 (EP,CN,US);
F25D23/065 (KR);
F25D23/064 (CN,US);
F25D23/063 (CN,US);
F16L59/065 (CN,KR,US);
F25D19/00 (KR);
F25D19/006 (CN,US);
F25D23/028 (CN,KR,US);
F25D23/082 (CN,US);
F25D2201/14 (EP,KR,US);
F25D2323/00 (CN);
F25D2500/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] |
Former [2022/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ADIABATISCHER VAKUUMKÖRPER UND KÜHLSCHRANK | [2022/12] | English: | VACUUM ADIABATIC BODY AND REFRIGERATOR | [2022/12] | French: | CORPS ADIABATIQUE SOUS VIDE ET RÉFRIGÉRATEUR | [2022/12] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 20.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16833338.3 / EP3332197 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE956899 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [YA]GB890372 (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | [X]DE9204365U ; | [XAY]JPH04341694 (KUBOTA KK); | [X]JPH0510494 (KUBOTA KK); | [A]DE102011079209 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]); | [A]US2015192356 (KANG BYEONG KOOK [KR], et al); | [AP]EP2952839 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | KR100343719B | US2004226956 | KR20150012712 |