EP4169399 - DISPENSER FOR DISPENSING A LIQUID CONTAINING NICOTINE AND / OR CANNABIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 27.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant | 27.10.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | 27.10.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptar Radolfzell GmbH Öschlestraße 54-56 78315 Radolfzell / DE | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alagia, Pierluigi 78345 Moos / DE | 02 /
Greiner-Perth, Jürgen 78244 Gottmadingen / DE | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Stuttgart Phoenixbau Königstraße 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21203534.9 | 19.10.2021 | [2023/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4169399 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/42, A61M11/04, A61M15/06 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
B65D83/46 (EP);
A61M15/0021 (EP);
A61M15/06 (EP);
B05B1/30 (EP);
B65D83/207 (EP);
B65D83/384 (EP);
A24F40/42 (EP);
A61M15/0023 (EP);
A61M15/009 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] |
Former [2023/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPENDER ZUR ABGABE EINER NIKOTIN- UND/ODER CANNABISHALTIGEN FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2023/17] | English: | DISPENSER FOR DISPENSING A LIQUID CONTAINING NICOTINE AND / OR CANNABIS | [2023/17] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR D'UN LIQUIDE CONTENANT DE LA NICOTINE ET/OU DU CANNABIS | [2023/17] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 26.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002008122 (RITSCHE STEFAN [DE], et al); | [A]WO2017191205 (APTAR RADOLFZELL GMBH [DE]); | [X]WO2019224531 (NICOVENTURES TRADING LTD [GB]); | [A]DE202019005638U (APTAR RADOLFZELL GMBH [DE]) |