EP4170306 - SEPARABLE COMPONENT OF A THERMAL ENERGY METER AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING A CONSUMPTION OF THERMAL ENERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/17] | SEPARABLE COMPONENT OF A THERMAL ENERGY METER | ||
[2024/35] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.08.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kamstrup A/S Industrivej 28 Stilling 8660 Skanderborg / DK | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jensen, Mads Erik Lund 8660 Skanderborg / DK | 02 /
Jensen, Allan 8660 Skanderborg / DK | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Hemmer Lindfeld Frese Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/17] | Patentanwälte Vollmann Hemmer Lindfeld Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 21203547.1 | 19.10.2021 | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4170306 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01K17/10, G01D4/00, G08C19/00, G01F1/00, G01K13/02, G01K7/16 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
G01K17/10 (EP);
G01K13/02 (EP);
G01K7/16 (EP);
G08C19/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] |
Former [2023/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRENNBARE KOMPONENTE EINES THERMISCHEN ENERGIEZÄHLERS UND METHODE ZUR ERMITTLUNG EINES THERMISCHEN ENERGIEVERBRAUCHS | [2024/35] | English: | SEPARABLE COMPONENT OF A THERMAL ENERGY METER AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING A CONSUMPTION OF THERMAL ENERGY | [2024/35] | French: | COMPOSANT SÉPARABLE D'UN COMPTEUR D'ÉNERGIE THERMIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE THERMIQUE | [2024/35] |
Former [2023/17] | TRENNBARE KOMPONENTE EINES THERMISCHEN ENERGIEZÄHLERS | ||
Former [2023/17] | SEPARABLE COMPONENT OF A THERMAL ENERGY METER | ||
Former [2023/17] | COMPOSANT SÉPARABLE D'UN COMPTEUR D'ÉNERGIE THERMIQUE | Examination procedure | 11.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 11.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014241399 (RUD JASON H [US]); | by applicant | EP2994724 |