EP3993246 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR NEUTRAL POINT BALANCING FOR BACK-TO-BACK VOLTAGE SOURCE CONVERTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Renovables España S.L. C/ Roc Boronat, 78 08005 Barcelona / ES | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagoner, Robert Gregory Salem, VA, 24153 / US | 02 /
Banda, Joseph Kiran 560066 Bangalore / IN | 03 /
Jha, Kapil 560066 Bangalore / IN | 04 /
Ramirez Sanchez, Fernando Arturo Salem, VA, 24153 / US | 05 /
Shaqqo, Bacil Salem, VA, 24153 / US | 06 /
Ittamveettil, Hridya 560066 Bangalore / IN | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 21204199.0 | 22.10.2021 | [2022/18] | Priority number, date | US202017084731 | 30.10.2020 Original published format: US202017084731 | [2022/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993246 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02M5/458, H02M7/483, H02M7/487 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
H02M5/4585 (EP,CN);
H02P9/102 (US);
F03D9/25 (US);
H02J3/38 (CN);
H02J3/381 (CN);
H02M7/4833 (EP);
H02M7/487 (EP);
H02P9/007 (US);
H02P9/305 (US);
F05B2220/706 (US);
H02J2300/28 (CN);
H02P2101/15 (US);
H02P2103/10 (US);
H02P2103/20 (US);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
Y02E10/76 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] |
Former [2022/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM NEUTRALPUNKTAUSGLEICH FÜR AUFEINANDERFOLGENDE SPANNUNGSQUELLENWANDLER | [2022/18] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR NEUTRAL POINT BALANCING FOR BACK-TO-BACK VOLTAGE SOURCE CONVERTERS | [2022/18] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉQUILIBRAGE DU POINT NEUTRE POUR DES CONVERTISSEURS DE SOURCE DE TENSION DOS À DOS | [2022/18] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 24.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2013163292 (BASIC DURO [DE], et al) [X] 1,12 * paragraph [0016]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0032] * [Y] 2-11,13-15; | [XY]US2018309379 (BASIC DURO [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,12,13 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0093] * [Y] 3-11,14,15; | [Y]CN111371338 (SHANGHAI BAOZHUN POWER TECH CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-15* abstract *; | [Y] - MALAKONDAREDDY B ET AL, "An adaptive PI control scheme to balance the neutral-point voltage in a solar PV fed grid connected neutral point clamped inverter", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ELECTRICAL POWER & ENERGY SYSTEMS, (20190930), vol. 110, doi:10.1016/J.IJEPES.2019.03.012, ISSN 0142-0615, pages 318 - 331, XP085665351 [Y] 1-15 * page 322 - page 323; figures 1,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijepes.2019.03.012 |