EP4169903 - CO-CRYSTALS OF NONSTEROIDAL ANTI-INFLAMMATORY DRUGS, LYSINE AND GABAPENTIN, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND THEIR MEDICAL USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dompe' Farmaceutici S.P.A. Via Santa Lucia 6 20122 Milan / IT | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAMINI, Andrea 67100 L'Aquila / IT | 02 /
BIANCHINI, Gianluca 67100 L'Aquila / IT | 03 /
LILLINI, Samuele 80131 Napoli / IT | 04 /
TOMASSETTI, Mara 80131 Napoli / IT | 05 /
BRANDOLINI, Laura 67100 L'Aquila / IT | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Mauri, Elisabetta Maria Ester Dompé Farmaceutici S.p.A. Via Santa Lucia, 6 20122 Milano / IT | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21204515.7 | 25.10.2021 | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4169903 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07C229/26, C07C57/30, C07C229/28, A61P29/00 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
A61P29/00 (EP,IL);
C07C229/26 (EP,IL);
C07C229/28 (EP,IL);
C07C57/30 (EP,IL);
C07C57/58 (EP,IL);
C07C59/64 (EP,IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CO-KRISTALLE VON NICHTSTEROIDALEN ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMENDEN ARZNEIMITTELN, LYSIN UND GABAPENTIN, PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND DEREN MEDIZINISCHE VERWENDUNG | [2023/17] | English: | CO-CRYSTALS OF NONSTEROIDAL ANTI-INFLAMMATORY DRUGS, LYSINE AND GABAPENTIN, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND THEIR MEDICAL USE | [2023/17] | French: | CO-CRISTAUX DE MÉDICAMENTS ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRES NON STÉROÏDIENS, LYSINE ET GABAPENTINE, COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES ET LEUR UTILISATION MÉDICALE | [2023/17] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/15] | 04.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2177215 (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES]); | [E]WO2021214158 (DOMPE FARM SPA [IT]); | by applicant | WO2021EP60421 |