EP4169498 - METHOD FOR GENERATING STIMULATION-AUDIO-FILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bottneuro AG Hochbergerstrasse 60C 4057 Basel / CH | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osmani, Bekim 4056 Basel / CH | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Mertzlufft-Paufler, Cornelius, et al Maucher Jenkins Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Urachstraße 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21204531.4 | 25.10.2021 | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4169498 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61H99/00, // H04S1/00, A61M21/00 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
A61M21/00 (EP);
A61M2021/0027 (EP);
A61M2205/3553 (EP);
A61M2205/3561 (EP);
A61M2205/3584 (EP);
A61M2205/3592 (EP);
A61M2205/505 (EP);
A61M2230/10 (EP);
H04R1/1008 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON STIMULATIONSAUDIODATEIEN | [2023/17] | English: | METHOD FOR GENERATING STIMULATION-AUDIO-FILES | [2023/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION DE FICHIERS AUDIO DE STIMULATION | [2023/17] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/15] | 04.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2011071340 (MCGUIRE JOHN F [US]) [X] 1-3,17,18 * paragraphs [0089] , [0100] , [0102] - [0104] * [Y] 7-9,16 [I] 4-6,10-15,19-21; | [I]US2018133507 (MALCHANO ZACHARY JOHN HAMBRECHT [US], et al) [I] 1,17-21 * paragraphs [0415] - [0418] - [0423] , [0457] , [0460]; figure 12B *; | [Y]CN112807544 (JIANGSU JICUI BRAIN COMPUTER FUSION INTELLIGENT TECH RESEARCH INSTITUTE CO LTD) [Y] 7-9,16* paragraph [0039] * |