EP3967966 - DEPLOYABLE ORIGAMI-INSPIRED BARRIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brigham Young University Technology Transfer Office 3760 Harold B. Lee Library Provo, UT 84602 / US | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOWELL, Larry L. Provo, UT 84602 / US | 02 /
MAGLEBY, Spencer P. Provo, UT 84602 / US | 03 /
MORGAN, David C. Provo, UT 84602 / US | 04 /
BATEMAN, Terri Provo, UT 84602 / US | 05 /
NIVEN, Jeffrey E. Provo, UT 84602 / US | 06 /
AVILA, Alex Provo, UT 84602 / US | 07 /
CRAMPTON, Erica Provo, UT 84602 / US | 08 /
TOLMAN, Kyler Provo, UT 84602 / US | 09 /
GREENWOOD, Jacob Provo, UT 84602 / US | 10 /
SCHLEEDE, Peter Provo, UT 84602 / US | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | M. Zardi & Co S.A. Via G. B. Pioda, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 21204567.8 | 06.09.2017 | [2022/11] | Priority number, date | US201662384398P | 07.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662384398 P | US201662409186P | 17.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662409186 P | US201762456275P | 08.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762456275 P | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3967966 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F41H5/04, F41H5/00, E01F13/00, E01F13/02, E06B9/06, F41H5/06, F41H5/013 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
F41H5/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F41H5/04 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
F41H5/013 (EP,CN,KR,US);
E01F13/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
E06B9/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F41H5/24 (EP,CN,KR,US);
E06B2009/007 (EP,CN,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] |
Former [2022/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ENTFALTBARE ORIGAMI-INSPIRIERTE BARRIEREN | [2022/11] | English: | DEPLOYABLE ORIGAMI-INSPIRED BARRIERS | [2022/11] | French: | BARRIÈRES INSPIRÉES DE L'ORIGAMI DÉPLOYABLES | [2022/11] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 07.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/33] | 18.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/33] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17849476.1 / EP3510343 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4949490 (MILLER MELVIN M [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2009151706 (FIBERWEB INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US7730925 (PEREIRA CARLOS E [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016061569 (FERNANDEZ DAVID FRYDERYK [US]) [A] 1-15 |