EP4002142 - EQUIPMENT REGISTRATION TERMINAL, EQUIPMENT REGISTRATION METHOD, AND EQUIPMENT REGISTRATION PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORPORATION 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ema, Nobuaki Musashino-shi, Tokyo, 180-8750 / JP | 02 /
Yoshida, Yoshitaka Musashino-shi, Tokyo, 180-8750 / JP | 03 /
Konada, Soichiro Musashino-shi, Tokyo, 180-8750 / JP | 04 /
Matsuda, Takaaki Musashino-shi, Tokyo, 180-8750 / JP | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 21204692.4 | 26.10.2021 | [2022/21] | Priority number, date | JP20200190396 | 16.11.2020 Original published format: JP 2020190396 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4002142 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4002142 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02, H04W4/38 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
H04W4/025 (EP);
H04W12/06 (CN);
G01S5/0244 (US);
G01S5/021 (US);
G01S5/0236 (US);
G06F21/36 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/21] | G06F16/00, H04W4/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] |
Former [2022/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUSRÜSTUNGSREGISTRIERUNGSENDGERÄT, AUSRÜSTUNGSREGISTRIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND AUSRÜSTUNGSREGISTRIERUNGSPROGRAMM | [2022/21] | English: | EQUIPMENT REGISTRATION TERMINAL, EQUIPMENT REGISTRATION METHOD, AND EQUIPMENT REGISTRATION PROGRAM | [2022/21] | French: | TERMINAL, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME D'ENREGISTREMENT D'ÉQUIPEMENT | [2022/21] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 13.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2237527 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2015358307 (OHBITSU TOSHIRO [JP]) [Y] 1-14* paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0030] - [0045] - [0084] - [0095] - [0102] - [0106] - [0119] - [0131] - [0156] , [0163] - [0173]; figure 12B *; | [IY]US2018352069 (HIRABAYASHI MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0008] , [0047] - [0060] - [0071] - [0101] - [0163] , [0171] , [0180] - [0183] - [0195] , [0210]; figures 1,2,3,5,16 * [Y] 1-14 | by applicant | JP2016139227 |