EP3995682 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A DRIVE SYSTEM OF A ROTORCRAFT COMPRISING AT LEAST TWO TURBOSHAFT ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES, HR, LV, NL, NO, PL, RS, SE | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Helicopters Aéroport International Marseille Provence 13725 Marignane Cedex / FR | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COSSETTI, Luca 13980 ALLEINS / FR | 02 /
MALBURET, François 13111 COUDOUX / FR | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | GPI Brevets 1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière EuroParc de Pichaury Bât B2 13856 Aix en Provence Cedex 3 / FR | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 21204841.7 | 26.10.2021 | [2022/19] | Priority number, date | FR20200011299 | 04.11.2020 Original published format: FR 2011299 | [2022/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3995682 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3995682 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F02C9/42, F02K5/00, F02C6/02 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
F02C9/42 (EP);
B64D31/00 (US);
B64C27/00 (US);
B64D27/10 (US);
B64D27/24 (US);
B64D37/005 (US);
F02C6/02 (EP);
F02C7/22 (US);
F02K5/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] |
Former [2022/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER TRIEBWERKSANLAGE EINES DREHFLÜGELFLUGZEUGS, DIE MINDESTENS ZWEI TURBOTRIEBWERKE UMFASST | [2022/19] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A DRIVE SYSTEM OF A ROTORCRAFT COMPRISING AT LEAST TWO TURBOSHAFT ENGINES | [2022/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PILOTAGE D'UNE INSTALLATION MOTRICE D'UN GIRAVION COMPRENANT AU MOINS DEUX TURBOMOTEURS | [2023/30] |
Former [2022/19] | PROCEDE DE PILOTAGE D'UNE INSTALLATION MOTRICE D'UN GIRAVION COMPRENANT AU MOINS DEUX TURBOMOTEURS | Examination procedure | 23.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 23.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP1990519 (PRATT & WHITNEY CANADA [CA]) [AD] 1 * figure 1 *; | [XDAI]EP2602458 (PRATT & WHITNEY CANADA [CA]) [XD] 1-3,6,7,9 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0018] * [A] 5 [I] 4,8; | [AD]WO2015145036 (TURBOMECA [FR]) [AD] 1* figure 1 *; | [AD]EP3415436 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [AD] 1 * figure 6 * | by applicant | EP1990519 | EP2602458 | WO2015052413 | WO2015145036 | FR3024707 | US2016333782 | EP3415436 | EP3783211 |