EP4104922 - REACTOR AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING ISOCYANATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2023 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude K12 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 21204944.9 | 27.10.2021 | [2022/51] | Priority number, date | US202163210145P | 14.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163210145 P | EP20210183607 | 05.07.2021 Original published format: EP 21183607 | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4104922 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00, B01J19/24, C07C263/10 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
B01J19/002 (EP);
B01J19/244 (EP);
C07C263/10 (EP);
B01J2219/00252 (EP);
B01J2219/185 (EP);
B01J2219/1943 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C263/10, C07C265/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REAKTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ISOCYANATEN | [2022/51] | English: | REACTOR AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING ISOCYANATES | [2022/51] | French: | RÉACTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'ISOCYANATES | [2022/51] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004167354 (BISKUP KLAUS [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XI]US6930199 (MEYN JUERGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * [I] 8-15; | [I]US2006041166 (STUART JOSEPH Y [US]) [I] 1-15* abstract * | by applicant | EP0144826 | EP0289840 | EP1319655 | EP1403248 | EP1449826 | EP1555258 | EP1935875 | WO2014006164 | WO2019145380 |