EP3981457 - ADJUSTABLE HEADGEAR TUBING FOR A PATIENT INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ResMed Pty Ltd 1 Elizabeth MacArthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOOIJ, Michiel Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | 02 /
BENTLEY, Alexander Joel Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | 03 /
BESIC, Igor Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | 04 /
BURNHAM, Robert Thomas Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | 05 /
DAVIDSON, Aaron Samuel Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | 06 /
GUPTA, Priyanshu Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | 07 /
HASKARD, Kirrily Michele Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | 08 /
KIRKPATRICK, Ryan Michael Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | 09 /
KLINKENBERG, Luke Emmanuel Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | 10 /
MAURER, Dimitri Marco Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | 11 /
ORMROD, Joseph Samuel Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | 12 /
RUMMERY, Gerard Michael Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | 13 /
SCHEINER, Rupert Christian Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | 14 /
SINGH, Bishavjot Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | 15 /
SMITH, Christopher James Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | 16 /
VON MOGER, Lochlan Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | 17 /
WATSON, Paul Derrick Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | 18 /
WEISS, Daniel Marc Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | 19 /
WHITE, Hadley Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | [2024/43] |
Former [2022/15] | 01 /
KOOIJ, Michiel Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | ||
02 /
BENTLEY, Alexander Joel Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | |||
03 /
BESIC, Igor Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | |||
04 /
BURNHAM, Robert Thomas Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | |||
05 /
DAVIDSON, Aaron, Samuel Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | |||
06 /
GUPTA, Pryanshu Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | |||
07 /
HASKARD, Kirrily Michele Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | |||
08 /
KIRKPATRICK, Ryan Michael Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | |||
09 /
KLINKENBERG, Luke Emmanuel Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | |||
10 /
MAURER, Dimitri Marco Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | |||
11 /
ORMROD, Joseph Samuel Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | |||
12 /
RUMMERY, Gerard Michael Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | |||
13 /
SCHEINER, Rupert Christian Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | |||
14 /
SINGH, Bishavjot Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | |||
15 /
SMITH, Christopher James Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | |||
16 /
VON MOGER, Lochlan Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | |||
17 /
WATSON, Paul Derrick Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | |||
18 /
WEISS, Daniel Marc Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | |||
19 /
WHITE, Hadley Bella Vista New South Wales 2153 / AU | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 21205499.3 | 23.01.2017 | [2022/15] | Priority number, date | US201662281322P | 21.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662281322 P | AU20160901163 | 30.03.2016 Original published format: AU 2016901163 | US201662330371P | 02.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662330371 P | WO2017AU50044 | 20.01.2017 Original published format: PCT/AU2017/050044 | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3981457 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/06, A61M16/08, A61M16/16, A61M16/00 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
A61M16/0683 (EP,CN,US);
A61M16/0605 (CN);
A61M16/06 (EP,US);
A61M16/0622 (US);
A61M16/0666 (EP,US);
A61M16/0672 (CN);
A61M16/0816 (EP,US);
A61M16/0875 (EP,CN,US);
A61M16/0883 (US);
A61M16/0066 (EP,US);
A61M16/109 (EP,US);
A61M16/125 (EP,US);
A61M16/16 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0021 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0027 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0208 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0216 (US);
A61M2205/15 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3375 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3653 (EP,US);
A61M2205/583 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6063 (EP,US);
A61M2210/0618 (EP,US);
A61M2210/0625 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/0208, A61M2202/0007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] |
Former [2022/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERSTELLBARE KOPFBEDECKUNGSLEITUNG FÜR PATIENTENSCHNITTSTELLE | [2022/15] | English: | ADJUSTABLE HEADGEAR TUBING FOR A PATIENT INTERFACE | [2022/15] | French: | TUBULURE DE CASQUE RÉGLABLE POUR UNE INTERFACE PATIENT | [2022/15] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 19.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17740918.2 / EP3405244 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005099801 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al); | [I]US2012325219 (SMITH DAVID W [US]); | [A]US2015182719 (GRASHOW JONATHAN SAYER [US], et al) | by applicant | US4782832 | US4944310 | WO9804310 | US6044844 | US6532959 | WO2004073778 | WO2005063328 | WO2006074513 | WO2006130903 | US2007246043 | US2009044808 | WO2009052560 | US2010000534 | WO2010135785 | US7866944 | WO2013020167 | US8638014 | US8636479 | US8733349 |