EP3992822 - PROTECTION METHOD, ASSOCIATED COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35 rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEURANT, Olivier 38400 SAINT-MARTIN-D'HÈRES / FR | 02 /
AUBERT, Florent 38920 CROLLES / FR | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 21205662.6 | 29.10.2021 | [2022/18] | Priority number, date | FR20200011213 | 02.11.2020 Original published format: FR 2011213 | [2022/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3992822 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/30, H04L9/32, H04W12/06 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
H04L63/08 (EP);
G06F21/121 (CN);
G06F21/54 (US);
G06F21/30 (EP);
G06F21/64 (US);
G06F21/76 (CN);
H04L9/3247 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (EP);
H04L2209/805 (EP);
Y04S40/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] |
Former [2022/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZVERFAHREN, ENTSPRECHENDES COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT UND ENTSPRECHENDE SYSTEME | [2022/18] | English: | PROTECTION METHOD, ASSOCIATED COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT AND SYSTEMS | [2022/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PROTECTION, PRODUIT-PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR ET SYSTÈMES ASSOCIÉS | [2022/18] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 05.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011184585 (MATSUDA SEIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0004] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0147] - [0348] * * paragraphs [0443] - [0558] * * claims 1-7 * * figures 1-8, 22-42, 60-68 *; | [X]US2013036311 (AKYOL BORA A [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * figures 1-15 * * paragraphs [0002] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0030] - [0082] * * paragraphs [0102] - [0195] * * claims 1-48 *; | [X]US2017180137 (SPANIER JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0003] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0112] * * paragraphs [0126] - [0207] * * claims 1-36 *; | [A] - SEO JUNG TAEK, "Towards the advanced security architecture for Microgrid systems and applications", JOURNAL OF SUPERCOMPUTING, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, NL, vol. 72, no. 9, doi:10.1007/S11227-016-1786-8, ISSN 0920-8542, (20160621), pages 3535 - 3548, (20160621), XP036042979 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 3535 - page 3548 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11227-016-1786-8 |