EP3996221 - RAIL FASTENING DEVICE, ARRANGEMENT AND SWITCH CABINET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstraße 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/19] | For all designated states Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstrasse 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSSE, Reiner 33719 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
STRUCKMANN, Sascha 32545 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 21205855.6 | 02.11.2021 | [2022/19] | Priority number, date | DE202010129264 | 06.11.2020 Original published format: DE102020129264 | [2022/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3996221 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/052, H01R9/26, H02B1/20, // H02B1/32 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
H02B1/052 (EP,CN);
H02B1/32 (EP,CN);
H02B1/20 (EP);
H02B1/202 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] |
Former [2022/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGSCHIENENBEFESTIGUNGSEINRICHTUNG, ANORDNUNG UND SCHALTSCHRANK | [2022/19] | English: | RAIL FASTENING DEVICE, ARRANGEMENT AND SWITCH CABINET | [2022/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION DE RAIL PORTEUR, AGENCEMENT ET ARMOIRE DE COMMANDE | [2022/19] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 25.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE2944372 (MILSPE KATTWINKEL AGALIT [DE]); | [X]FR2638033 (LEGRAND SA [FR]); | [A]DE19610854 (WAGO VERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0871248 (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]); | [A]US5944566 (GOSSMANN CHRISTIAN [FR]); | [I]DE102019105077 (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) |