EP4040341 - PROCESSOR, METHOD OF OPERATING THE PROCESSOR, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | For all designated states Seoul National University R & DB Foundation 1, Gwanak-ro Gwanak-Gu Seoul 08826 / KR | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Seung Wook Suwon-si / KR | 02 /
Won, Jaeyeon Seoul / KR | 03 /
Lee, Jae Wook Seoul / KR | 04 /
Ham, Tae Jun Seoul / KR | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 21205960.4 | 02.11.2021 | [2022/32] | Priority number, date | KR20210017469 | 08.02.2021 Original published format: KR 20210017469 | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4040341 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/063, G06N3/04, G06F7/499, G06F7/544 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
G06N3/063 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F17/16 (US);
G06F5/01 (US);
G06F5/012 (KR);
G06F7/4991 (EP);
G06F7/50 (US);
G06F7/523 (US);
G06F7/5443 (EP,US);
G06F7/78 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] |
Former [2022/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROZESSOR, VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DES PROZESSORS UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, WELCHE DEN PROZESSOR UMFASST | [2022/32] | English: | PROCESSOR, METHOD OF OPERATING THE PROCESSOR, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME | [2022/32] | French: | PROCESSEUR, PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT DU PROCESSEUR ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE LE COMPRENANT | [2022/32] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 10.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |