EP4019802 - VALVE ASSEMBLY FOR A VIBRATION DAMPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KTM AG Stallhofnerstrasse 3 5230 Mattighofen / AT | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIMMER, Johannes 84556 Kastl / DE | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Söllner, Udo PATLECTOR Patentanwaltskanzlei Freundorferstr. 34c 85598 Baldham / DE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 21206193.1 | 03.11.2021 | [2022/26] | Priority number, date | DE202010134820 | 23.12.2020 Original published format: DE102020134820 | [2022/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4019802 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4019802 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/348, F16F9/46 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
F16F9/3487 (EP);
F16F9/3484 (US);
F16F9/18 (US);
F16F9/369 (US);
F16F9/465 (EP,US);
F16F9/466 (EP);
F16F9/469 (EP);
F16K15/148 (US);
F16K27/0209 (US);
F16K31/402 (US);
B62K25/08 (EP);
F16F2222/12 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | VENTILANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN SCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFER | [2022/26] | English: | VALVE ASSEMBLY FOR A VIBRATION DAMPER | [2022/26] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE SOUPAPE POUR UN AMORTISSEUR DE VIBRATIONS | [2022/26] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 04.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR100443884B (MANDO CORP [KR]) [A] 2,3* figures 1-7 *; | [XAY]US2016025178 (KAMAKURA RYOSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,8,9,11-13 * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0046]; figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0103] * [A] 4,10 [Y] 2,3,6,7; | [YA]WO2020026362 (SHOWA CORP [JP]) [Y] 2,3,6,7 * figures 6-8 * [A] 1; | [AD]EP3208489 (OEHLINS RACING AB [SE]) [AD] 1-13 * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | EP3208489 |