EP4176768 - SHELF SYSTEM COMPRISED OF INJECTION MOULDED PLASTIC PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rotho Kunststoff AG Industriestrasse Althau 11 5303 Würenlingen / CH | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thoma, Christian 79774 Abbruck / DE | 02 /
Brunner, Markus 5613 Hilfikon / CH | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 21206973.6 | 08.11.2021 | [2023/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4176768 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4176768 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47B47/00, A47B47/04, A47B87/02 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
A47B87/0269 (EP);
A47B47/0008 (EP);
A47B47/045 (EP);
A47B47/047 (EP);
A47B2210/19 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] |
Former [2023/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | REGALSYSTEM AUS SPRITZGEGOSSENEN KUNSTSTOFFTEILEN | [2023/19] | English: | SHELF SYSTEM COMPRISED OF INJECTION MOULDED PLASTIC PARTS | [2023/19] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RAYONNAGE COMPOSÉ DE PARTIESS EN MATIÈRE PLASTIQUE MOULÉES PAR INJECTION | [2023/19] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 17.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 07.02.2024 | ES | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | NL | 07.02.2024 | SE | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 07.02.2024 | |
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 07.02.2024 | |
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN204157977U (WU FUJIN); | [A]US2021137268 (KOBAYASHI SUSUMU [JP]) |