EP4019897 - AUTONOMOUS TRAVEL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | [2024/13] |
Former [2022/26] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uno, Takashi Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 21207119.5 | 09.11.2021 | [2022/26] | Priority number, date | JP20200201616 | 04.12.2020 Original published format: JP 2020201616 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4019897 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4019897 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4019897 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/00, G01C21/30, G01S19/41, G01C21/36, G01S19/48, G01C15/00, // G01S19/14 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
G01C21/3822 (EP);
B60W40/10 (CN);
B60W60/001 (US);
B60W10/04 (CN);
B60W10/20 (CN);
B60W40/02 (CN);
G01C15/002 (EP);
G01C21/30 (EP);
G01C21/3602 (EP);
G01C21/3848 (EP);
G01S19/485 (EP,US);
G06T7/579 (US);
G06V20/588 (US);
H01Q1/3233 (US);
H04W4/44 (US);
B60W2420/403 (CN);
B60W2556/40 (US);
B60W2556/50 (CN,US);
G01S19/14 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/41] | G01C21/00, G01C21/30, G01S19/41, G01C21/36, G01S19/48, G01C15/00 | ||
Former IPC [2022/26] | G01C21/00, G01C21/30, G01S19/41, G01C21/36, G01S19/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | AUTONOMES FAHRSYSTEM | [2022/26] | English: | AUTONOMOUS TRAVEL SYSTEM | [2022/26] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉPLACEMENT AUTONOME | [2022/26] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 12.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]KR20060003546 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR101035538B ; | [YA]US2014371952 (OHTOMO FUMIO [JP], et al); | [A]AU2015347785 (YANMAR CO LTD); | [YA]US2017248948 (OTANI HITOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]KR20190073144 (AIN TECH CO LTD [KR]); | [IAY]US2019265038 (ASHBROOK ANTHONY [GB]); | by applicant | US8725413 |