EP4032544 - NOVEL T CELL RECEPTORS AND IMMUNE THERAPY USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immatics Biotechnologies GmbH Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 15 72076 Tübingen / DE | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALTEN, Leonie 72076 Tübingen / DE | 02 /
BUNK, Sebastian 72076 Tübingen / DE | 03 /
MAURER, Dominik 72076 Tübingen / DE | 04 /
WAGNER, Claudia 72076 Tübingen / DE | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 21207265.6 | 07.12.2017 | [2022/30] | Priority number, date | DE201610123847 | 08.12.2016 Original published format: DE102016123847 | US201662431588P | 08.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662431588 P | [2022/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4032544 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4032544 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, C07K14/725, C07K14/47 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
C07K14/4748 (EP,US);
C07K14/7051 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/55 (US);
A61K35/17 (US);
A61K38/1774 (US);
A61K39/0011 (US);
A61K39/001186 (US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/4632 (EP,US);
A61K39/464486 (EP,US);
A61K39/464488 (EP,US);
A61K47/64 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
C07K16/30 (KR);
C12N15/85 (US);
C12N5/00 (US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/57484 (KR);
A61K2039/572 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/70514 (EP,US);
C07K14/70517 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] |
Former [2022/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 14.06.2023 | ME | 14.06.2023 | Validation states | MA | 14.06.2023 | MD | 14.06.2023 | TN | 14.06.2023 | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE T-ZELL-REZEPTOREN UND IMMUNTHERAPIE MIT VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2022/30] | English: | NOVEL T CELL RECEPTORS AND IMMUNE THERAPY USING THE SAME | [2022/30] | French: | NOUVEAUX RÉCEPTEURS DE LYMPHOCYTES T ET IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE LES UTILISANT | [2022/30] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 14.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17829609.1 / EP3551221 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013039889 (US HEALTH [US], et al); | [A]WO2014118236 (MAX DELBRÜCK CT FÜR MOLEDULARE MEDIZIN MDC BERLIN BUCH [DE]); | [X]US2015337369 (DAVIS MARK M [US], et al); | [AP]WO2017158103 (IMMATICS BIOTECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]); | [T]WO2017216324 (MEDIGENE IMMUNOTHERAPIES GMBH [DE]); | [T]WO2018170338 (HUTCHINSON FRED CANCER RES [US]); | [T]WO2019067242 (US HEALTH [US]); | by applicant | US5545806 | US5569825 | US5714352 | US2002197266 |