EP3988152 - NASAL PILLOWS FOR A PATIENT INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place 2013 Auckland / NZ | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCAULEY, Alastair, Edwin 2013 Auckland / NZ | 02 /
PRENTICE, Craig, Robert 2013 Auckland / NZ | 03 /
MONRO, Rory, Alexander 2013 Auckland / NZ | 04 /
MASON, Isaac, Tristram, Tane 2013 Auckland / NZ | 05 /
GESLAIN, Nadjean, Maurice, Gabriel 2013 Auckland / NZ | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 21207502.2 | 09.10.2009 | [2022/17] | Priority number, date | US20080104377P | 10.10.2008 Original published format: US 104377 P | [2022/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3988152 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/06, A61M16/08 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
A61M16/0666 (EP,US);
A61M16/0611 (US);
A61M16/0683 (EP,US);
A61M16/0816 (EP,US);
A61M16/0825 (EP,US);
A61M16/0875 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] |
Former [2022/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NASALE KISSEN FÜR EINE PATIENTENSCHNITTSTELLE | [2022/17] | English: | NASAL PILLOWS FOR A PATIENT INTERFACE | [2022/17] | French: | COUSSINETS NASAUX DESTINÉS À UNE INTERFACE PATIENT | [2022/17] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 19.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09819444.2 / EP2349428 | EP17191661.2 / EP3323462 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007147088 (RIC INVESTMENTS LLC [US]); | [A]WO2008007985 (FISHER & PAYKEL HEALTHCARE LTD [NZ], et al); | [XAI]US2008060657 (MCAULEY ALASTAIR EDWIN [NZ], et al); | [XAI]US2008099024 (GUNARATNAM MICHAEL K [AU], et al); | [I]US2008196728 (HO PETER CHI FAI [US]) | by applicant | WO2008014543 | US19550610608 | EP20170191661 |