EP3970532 - AN ELECTRICALLY HEATED SMOKING SYSTEM WITH INTERNAL OR EXTERNAL HEATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREIM, Olivier Villars-Burquin / CH | 02 /
PLOJOUX, Julien Geneva / CH | 03 /
RUSCIO, Dani Cressier / CH | 04 /
ZUBER, Gerard Froidevilla / CH | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/12] | Ponder, William Anthony John Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 21207510.5 | 26.11.2010 | [2022/12] | Priority number, date | EP20090252687 | 27.11.2009 Original published format: EP 09252687 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3970532 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/46, // A24F40/20 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
A24F40/46 (EP,KR,US);
A24D1/20 (KR);
A24B15/16 (KR);
A24D1/02 (KR);
A24D1/045 (KR);
A24F40/50 (KR);
A24F40/51 (KR);
A24F40/57 (KR);
A24F40/10 (EP,US);
A24F40/20 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] |
Former [2022/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH ERHITZTES RAUCHSYSTEM MIT INTERNER ODER EXTERNER HEIZVORRICHTUNG | [2022/12] | English: | AN ELECTRICALLY HEATED SMOKING SYSTEM WITH INTERNAL OR EXTERNAL HEATER | [2022/12] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FUMAGE CHAUFFÉ ÉLECTRIQUEMENT DOTÉ D'UN CHAUFFAGE INTERNE OU EXTERNE | [2022/12] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 21.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10793150.3 / EP2503912 | EP17187283.1 / EP3266323 | EP20180096.8 / EP3741225 | Divisional application(s) | EP24188105.1 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0438862 (PHILIP MORRIS [US]); | [A]WO9527411 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [US]); | [A]US5915387 (BAGGETT JR JAMES D [US], et al); | [A]DE19854009 (REEMTSMA H F & PH [DE]); | [A]WO2007042941 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]); | [A]EP2113178 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) | by applicant | EP0358002 | EP20090252501 |