EP4026845 - ANTI-NERVE GROWTH FACTOR ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF PREPARING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zoetis Services LLC 10 Sylvan Way Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEARING, David Victoria / AU | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 21207684.8 | 08.05.2012 | [2022/28] | Priority number, date | US201161483488P | 06.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161483488 P | US201161531439P | 06.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161531439 P | [2022/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4026845 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/22, C07K16/46, A61P25/04, A61K39/00 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
C07K16/22 (EP,GB,KR,RU);
A61K38/17 (KR);
A61K38/18 (KR);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K47/42 (KR);
A61K48/00 (KR);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K14/435 (KR);
C07K14/475 (KR);
C07K16/18 (KR);
C07K16/28 (KR);
C07K16/46 (KR);
C07K16/467 (EP,GB,RU);
A01K2207/20 (EP);
A01K2227/10 (EP);
A01K2267/0368 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
C07K2317/24 (EP,GB);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] |
Former [2022/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN NERVENWACHSTUMSFAKTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2022/28] | English: | ANTI-NERVE GROWTH FACTOR ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF PREPARING AND USING THE SAME | [2022/28] | French: | ANTICORPS CONTRE LE FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE NEURONALE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2022/28] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 13.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12723731.1 / EP2705055 | EP18205428.8 / EP3498732 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03060080 (IDEXX LAB INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2005061540 (LAY LINE GENOMICS SPA [IT], et al); | [Y]WO2006131951 (LAY LINE GENOMICS SPA [IT], et al); | [Y]WO2010027488 (VET THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al); | [AP]WO2012024650 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al); | by applicant | US4376110 | EP0368684 | WO9222324 | US5831012 | WO9916873 | US6291158 | WO0220565 | US6582915 | US6593081 | WO2004044011 | WO2006131951 | US7250297 | US2007191272 |