EP3971674 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR UAV FLIGHT CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd. 6/F Hkust SZ IER Bldg. 9, Yuexing 1st Road Hi Tech Park (South) Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Chaobin Shenzhen / CN | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 21207823.2 | 09.12.2015 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3971674 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3971674 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/12, B64C19/02, G05D1/00 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
G05D1/2232 (EP);
G05D1/0016 (US);
G05D1/0044 (US);
G05D1/0094 (US);
G05D1/101 (US);
G05D1/106 (US);
G05D1/2246 (EP);
G05D1/46 (EP);
G05D1/689 (EP);
B64U10/13 (EP,US);
B64U2101/30 (US);
B64U2101/60 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] |
Former [2022/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR FLUGSTEUERUNG EINES UNBEMANNTEN LUFTFAHRZEUGS (UAV) | [2022/12] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR UAV FLIGHT CONTROL | [2022/12] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMANDE DE VOL DE VÉHICULE AÉRIEN SANS PILOTE (UAV) | [2022/12] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 20.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15910022.1 / EP3387507 | Divisional application(s) | EP23219737.6 / EP4342792 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2024 | BG | 14.02.2024 | ES | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | LV | 14.02.2024 | NL | 14.02.2024 | PL | 14.02.2024 | SE | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | |
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010084513 (GARIEPY RYAN [CA], et al); | [XY]US9164506 (ZANG BO [CN]); | Examination | US2015341540 |