EP4180131 - CENTRIFUGE ROTOR, ROTOR COVER AND ROTOR BOTTOM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eppendorf SE Barkhausenweg 1 22339 Hamburg / DE | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÜHNERT, Steffen 22339 Hamburg / DE | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Hecht, Jan-David, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Hecht Ranstädter Steinweg 28 04109 Leipzig / DE | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 21207835.6 | 11.11.2021 | [2023/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4180131 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B04B5/04, B04B7/02, B04B7/08 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
B04B7/08 (EP);
B04B5/0414 (EP);
B04B7/02 (EP);
B04B2007/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZENTRIFUGENROTOR, ROTORDECKEL UND ROTORUNTERTEIL | [2023/20] | English: | CENTRIFUGE ROTOR, ROTOR COVER AND ROTOR BOTTOM | [2023/20] | French: | ROTOR CENTRIFUGE, COUVERCLE DE ROTOR ET PARTIE INFÉRIEURE DE ROTOR | [2023/20] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/16] | 08.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP3132855 (HETTICH ANDREAS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0070] * * figures 1,2a-2c,4,5a-5c *; | [A]CN113522540 (RWD LIFE SCIENCE CO LTD) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | WO2018234334 | WO2019121581 | WO2019121214 |