EP4000741 - ELECTRIC SPRAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techtronic Cordless GP 100 Innovation Way Anderson, SC 29621 / US | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOYLAN, Justin Easley, SC 29642 / US | 02 /
TONER, Justin Anderson, SC 29621 / US | 03 /
KANE, Adam Anderson, SC 29621 / US | 04 /
SUAREZ, Josef Manuel Anderson, SC 29621 / US | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/21] | Parker, Andrew James Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21208023.8 | 12.11.2021 | [2022/21] | Priority number, date | US202063113377P | 13.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063113377 P | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4000741 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/00, B05B5/00 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
B05B5/1691 (EP);
B05B5/053 (US);
A61L2/22 (EP);
B05B1/1654 (EP);
B05B14/00 (EP);
B05B5/043 (EP);
B05B9/043 (US);
B05B9/085 (US);
B05B9/0861 (US);
A61L2202/11 (EP);
A61L2202/15 (EP);
A61L2202/16 (EP);
B05B1/3093 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES SPRÜHGERÄT | [2022/21] | English: | ELECTRIC SPRAYER | [2022/21] | French: | PULVÉRISATEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/21] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 26.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/18] | 19.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2019030554 (MANTES JONATHAN M [US], et al) |