EP4002384 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR VOICE-BASED TRAUMA SCREENING USING DEEP-LEARNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emocog Co., Ltd. 101, 18, Yongmasan-ro 112-gil Jungnang-gu Seoul 02176 / KR | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noh, Yoo Hun 11479 Yanggu-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 21208181.4 | 15.11.2021 | [2022/21] | Priority number, date | KR20200152939 | 16.11.2020 Original published format: KR 20200152939 | KR20210132219 | 06.10.2021 Original published format: KR 20210132219 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4002384 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G16H50/20, G16H50/70 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
G16H50/20 (EP);
G10L25/63 (CN,KR,US);
G10L25/66 (CN);
A61B5/165 (US);
A61B5/4803 (US);
G06N20/00 (KR,US);
G10L15/22 (US);
G10L19/02 (KR);
G10L21/12 (US);
G10L25/18 (US);
G10L25/30 (CN);
G10L25/45 (CN);
G16H50/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SPRACHBASIERTEN TRAUMA-UNTERSUCHUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON TIEFENLERNEN | [2022/21] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR VOICE-BASED TRAUMA SCREENING USING DEEP-LEARNING | [2022/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉPISTAGE DE TRAUMATISMES BASÉ SUR LA VOIX UTILISANT L'APPRENTISSAGE PROFOND | [2022/21] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 24.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2019246239 (ELLIPSIS HEALTH INC [US], et al); | by applicant | KR100189765B |