EP4181239 - ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.04.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Litricity GmbH Anton-Jakob-Straße 5 83026 Rosenheim / DE | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/20] | For all designated states Litricity GmbH Laurentiusstr. 2 83080 Oberaudorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stimming, Prof. Dr. Ulrich 83080 Oberaudorf / DE | 02 /
Diekmann, Dr. Marc Henning 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/20] | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21208274.7 | 15.11.2021 | [2023/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4181239 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/86, H01M4/90, H01M8/1018, H01M8/18 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
H01M8/188 (EP,KR);
H01M4/9016 (EP,KR);
H01M4/9041 (EP,KR);
H01M4/9083 (EP,KR);
H01M4/9091 (EP,KR);
H01M4/925 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] |
Former [2023/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHE ZELLE | [2023/20] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL | [2023/20] | French: | CELLULE ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE | [2023/20] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 16.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011014527 (OHLSEN LEROY JAMES [US]); | by applicant | EP0517217 | EP3432402 | EP3435464 | EP3439093 | EP3561932 |