EP4007133 - ELECTRIC MACHINE WITH AN INTEGRATED HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo eAutomotive Germany GmbH Frauenauracher Straße 85 91056 Erlangen / DE | [2022/35] |
Former [2022/22] | For all designated states Valeo Siemens eAutomotive Germany GmbH Frauenauracher Str. 85 91056 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAAS, Bernd 91056 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
POLLAK, Burkhard 91056 Erlangen / DE | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Valeo Powertrain Systems Service Propriété Intellectuelle Immeuble le Delta 14, avenue des Béguines 95892 Cergy Pontoise / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/22] | Novembre, Christophe Adelphe Valeo Siemens eAutomotive France SAS Propriété Intellectuelle 14 avenue des Béguines 95800 Cergy / FR | Application number, filing date | 21208334.9 | 15.11.2021 | [2022/22] | Priority number, date | DE202010214829 | 25.11.2020 Original published format: DE102020214829 | [2022/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4007133 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/20, H02K9/18, H02K9/19, H02K7/116, H02K7/08 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
H02K5/203 (EP,CN);
H02K1/20 (CN);
H02K5/20 (US);
H02K5/207 (CN);
H02K7/003 (US);
H02K7/006 (US);
H02K7/08 (US);
H02K7/116 (EP,US);
H02K9/18 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE MIT INTEGRIERTEM WÄRMETAUSCHER | [2022/22] | English: | ELECTRIC MACHINE WITH AN INTEGRATED HEAT EXCHANGER | [2022/22] | French: | MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE COMPRENANT UN ÉCHANGEUR THERMIQUE INTÉGRÉ | [2022/22] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 13.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]SU951566 (BONDARENKO ALEKSANDR K, et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 5-10[I] 4; | [XAI]EP2020735 (RITZ PUMPENFABRIK GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041] * [A] 5-10 [I] 4; | [XAI]DE102011084033 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,8,10 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038]; figures 2-4 * [A] 6,7,9 [I] 4; | [XAI]EP3028888 (ATIEVA INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,10 * paragraph [0038]; figures 5,6,10 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * [A] 6,9 [I] 4; | [X]DE102016110658 (PULS RAINER [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0016]; figures 1-6 *; | [XAI]DE102018121203 (THYSSENKRUPP AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7-10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0009] , [0015] , [0016] , [0020] , [0021] , [0028] , [0038] , [0048] , [0065]; figures 1-14 * [A] 6 [I] 4 |