EP4018891 - TEMPERING ELEMENT FOR A FOOD CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Maximilian 81669 München / DE | 02 /
Bosen, Peter 85354 Freising / DE | 03 /
Dudarenka, Alena 80797 München / DE | 04 /
Schmid, Paul 80333 München / DE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 21208437.0 | 16.11.2021 | [2022/26] | Priority number, date | DE202010215335 | 04.12.2020 Original published format: DE102020215335 | [2022/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4018891 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47J36/32, A47J39/02 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
A47J39/02 (EP);
A47J36/32 (EP);
A47J2201/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] |
Former [2022/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEMPERIERUNGSELEMENT FÜR EINEN SPEISENBEHÄLTER | [2022/26] | English: | TEMPERING ELEMENT FOR A FOOD CONTAINER | [2022/26] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE RÉGULATION DE LA TEMPÉRATURE POUR UN RÉCIPIENT ALIMENTAIRE | [2022/26] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 02.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/43] | 27.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012094770 (INDUCS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-4 ** sentence 13 - sentence 17 *; | [A]AT14176U (JOSEF HÖLLER GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-4; claim 1 * * page 4, line 9 - line 19 *; | [A]EP3311715 (PRINCE CASTLE LLC [US]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-3; claim 1 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0028] *; | [XA] - Anonymous, "Cookpad Induction Hob 30 cm 2 Zone Built-In Induction Hob Flexible Hob for Grill, Electric Hob with Plug and Touch Screen 3500 W : Amazon.de: Home & Kitchen", (20200918), pages 1 - 10, URL: https://www.amazon.de/COOKPAD-Induktionskochplatte-Induktionskochfeld-Elektroherd-Touchscreen/dp/B08JFXYCTQ/ref=asc_df_B08JFXYCTQ/?tag=googshopde-21&linkCode=df0&hvadid=500812895709&hvpos=&hvnetw=g&hvrand=6198173758597958928&hvpone=&hvptwo=&hvqmt=&hvdev=c&hvdvcmdl=&hvlocint=&hvlocphy=9061163&hvtargi, (20220510), XP055919835 [X] 10,13 * page 1 - page 2 * [A] 1-9,11,12,14 |